MI SB0435 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 161'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Courts; drug court; certification of drug treatment courts by the state court administrative office; require. Amends secs. 1062 & 1084 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.1062 & 600.1084).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts; drug court; certification of drug treatment courts by the state court administrative office; require. Amends secs. 1062 & 1084 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.1062 & 600.1084).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 435 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 330 (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 329 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-28SenateAssigned Pa 161'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-11-28SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 11/13/2017 @ 9:54 Am
2017-11-28SenateApproved By Governor 11/9/2017 @ 11:19 Am
2017-11-08SenatePresented To Governor 11/7/2017 @ 3:16 Pm
2017-11-01SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-11-01SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2017-11-01SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-11-01Senate Roll Call # 435 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0
2017-11-01SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2017-10-26HouseReturned To Senate
2017-10-26HouseTitle Amended
2017-10-26HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 330 Yeas 97 Nays 9
2017-10-26HouseRead A Third Time
2017-10-25HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-10-25HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2017-10-25HouseRead A Second Time
2017-10-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-10-17HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-09-12HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2017-09-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-09-12HouseReceived On 09/12/2017
2017-09-12SenatePassed Roll Call # 329 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2017-09-07SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2017-09-07SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2017-09-07SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-06-15SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-06-15SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-06-15SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-06-07SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2017-06-07SenateIntroduced By Senator Tonya Schuitmaker

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0435
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0435.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0435.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0435.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0435.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0161.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-06-15-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-09-12-069.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-17-078.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-26-083.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-11-01-090.htm

Bill Comments

feedback