MI SB0432 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0216'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0216'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund; tax exemption for entities receiving aid from the Michigan strategic fund; clarify. Amends sec. 74 of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2074).
Title
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund; tax exemption for entities receiving aid from the Michigan strategic fund; clarify. Amends sec. 74 of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2074).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 398 (Y: 91 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 53 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 53 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0216'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2020 12:44 Pm |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/15/2020 10:14 Am |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/05/2020 11:24 Am |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-09-23 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-09-23 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 398 Yeas 91 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2020-02-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-18 | House | Received On 02/18/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 53 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Adopted |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ken Horn |
Subjects
Economic development: economic development corporations
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund