MI SB0422 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-21 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-21 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of failing to yield or stop upon immediate approach of authorized emergency vehicle; provide for. Amends sec. 12g, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.12g). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0421'15
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of failing to yield or stop upon immediate approach of authorized emergency vehicle; provide for. Amends sec. 12g, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.12g). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0421'15
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Curtis Hertel [D] | Sen. David Knezek [D] | Sen. Morris Hood [D] |
Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 452 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-10-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-21 | House | Received On 10/21/2015 |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 452 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Subjects
Crimes: vehicle offenses
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Traffic control: traffic regulation
Traffic control: violations
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Traffic control: traffic regulation
Traffic control: violations