MI SB0419 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Pa 0058'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Pa 0058'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; other; considerations for returning child to custody of parent; modify. Amends secs. 2, 18, 19, 19a & 19b, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.2 et seq.).
Title
Juveniles; other; considerations for returning child to custody of parent; modify. Amends secs. 2, 18, 19, 19a & 19b, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.2 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 97 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 86 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 83 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 466 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 86 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 83 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 466 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0058'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/14/2018 @ 1:04 Pm |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/13/2018 @ 11:50 Am |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/1/2018 @ 2:03 Pm |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Roll Call # 97 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 1 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2018-02-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed Roll Call # 86 Yeas 104 Nays 4 |
2018-02-20 | House | Vote Reconsidered |
2018-02-20 | House | Title Amended |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 83 Yeas 102 Nays 6 |
2018-02-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-30 | House | Received On 11/30/2017 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 466 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Judith Emmons |