MI SB0409 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Assigned Pa 0125'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Assigned Pa 0125'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; controlled substances; attempt to solicit another person to purchase ephedrine or pseudoephedrine for purpose of manufacturing methamphetamine; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends sec. 7340c of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7340c).
Title
Crimes; controlled substances; attempt to solicit another person to purchase ephedrine or pseudoephedrine for purpose of manufacturing methamphetamine; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends sec. 7340c of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7340c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 233 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 418 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 418 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0125'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/25/2016 @ 10:14 Am |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/25/2016 @ 9:32 Am |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/19/2016 @ 11:34 Am |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-05-10 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-05-10 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-05-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 233 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-05-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-10-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-13 | House | Received On 10/13/2015 |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 418 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |
Same As/Similar To
HB4767 (Same As) 2015-10-29 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary