MI SB0405 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: pawnbrokers; allowable rate of interest charged by pawnbrokers; increase, and provide civil fines. Amends title & secs. 8, 9 & 18 of 1917 PA 273 (MCL 446.208 et seq.).
Title
Occupations: pawnbrokers; allowable rate of interest charged by pawnbrokers; increase, and provide civil fines. Amends title & secs. 8, 9 & 18 of 1917 PA 273 (MCL 446.208 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 363 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 363 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-10-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-10-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-05 | House | Received On 10/05/2021 |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 363 Yeas 24 Nays 10 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael D. Macdonald |