MI SB0396 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-02 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-02 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming: horse racing; pari-mutuel wagering on horse races run in the past; allow, and modify certain licensing procedures. Amends secs. 2, 12, 14, 17, 19, 20, 20a & 22 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.302 et seq.) & repeals seq. 19b of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.319b).
Title
Gaming: horse racing; pari-mutuel wagering on horse races run in the past; allow, and modify certain licensing procedures. Amends secs. 2, 12, 14, 17, 19, 20, 20a & 22 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.302 et seq.) & repeals seq. 19b of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.319b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 422 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-11-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-11-02 | House | Received On 11/02/2021 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 422 Yeas 27 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dan Lauwers |