MI SB0396 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; violations; bond requirement for certain vehicles transporting forest products; impose under certain circumstances and make other revisions. Amends secs. 722 & 725 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.722 & 257.725) & adds sec. 719d.
Title
Traffic control; violations; bond requirement for certain vehicles transporting forest products; impose under certain circumstances and make other revisions. Amends secs. 722 & 725 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.722 & 257.725) & adds sec. 719d.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 743 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 657 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 657 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2018 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 743 Yeas 21 Nays 15 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reconsider Vote Postponed |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Defeated Roll Call # 657 Yeas 17 Nays 19 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-6 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-6 Concurred In |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-6 |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-5 |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |