MI SB0395 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; deductions; tax credit for certain home modifications; establish. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 277.
Title
Individual income tax; deductions; tax credit for certain home modifications; establish. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 277.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 133 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2016-03-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-03-23 | House | Received On 03/23/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 133 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Vincent Gregory |
Same As/Similar To
HB4719 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - Printed Bill Filed 06/17/2015