MI SB0395 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0332'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0332'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; assessments; assessment notice; revise time to 30 days. Amends sec. 24c of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.24c).
Title
Property tax; assessments; assessment notice; revise time to 30 days. Amends sec. 24c of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.24c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0332'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2010 @ 12:34 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/21/2010 @ 11:42 Am | |
2010-12-29 | Presented To Governor 12/17/2010 @ 2:06 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-15 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-15 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-03 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-03 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-03 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 600 Yeas 92 Nays 1 | |
2010-12-03 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-03 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-03 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-03 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-11-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-09 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-03-25 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2010-03-25 | Read A First Time | |
2010-03-25 | Received On 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Passed Roll Call # 172 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment(s) Defeated | |
2010-03-18 | Postponed For The Day | |
2010-03-18 | Amendment(s) Ruled Germane | |
2010-03-18 | Amendment(s) Offered | |
2010-03-18 | Postponed Temporarily | |
2010-03-18 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-17 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-03-17 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-03-17 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-03-16 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-03-16 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-19 | Referred To Committee On Finance |