MI SB0381 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Education: other; certain requirements for the approval of teacher preparation institutions; create. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1531e.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education: other; certain requirements for the approval of teacher preparation institutions; create. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1531e.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 226 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-11HouseReferred To Committee On Education
2022-05-11HouseRead A First Time
2022-05-11HouseReceived On 05/11/2022
2022-05-11SenatePassed Roll Call # 226 Yeas 32 Nays 1 Excused 5 Not Voting 0
2022-05-10SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2022-05-10SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2022-05-10SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2022-03-23SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2022-03-23SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2021-04-22SenateReferred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness
2021-04-22SenateIntroduced By Senator Lana Theis

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0381
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0381.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0381.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0381-00B74.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0381-00D47.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0380-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0380-F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-03-23-030.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-05-11-045.htm

Bill Comments

feedback