MI SB0379 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Assigned Pa 0068'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Assigned Pa 0068'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; code; references of venereal disease; revise to sexually transmitted infection. Amends sec. 5123 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.5123). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0374'15, SB 0375'15, SB 0376'15, SB 0377'15, SB 0378'15, SB 0380'15, SB 0381'15
Title
Health; code; references of venereal disease; revise to sexually transmitted infection. Amends sec. 5123 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.5123). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0374'15, SB 0375'15, SB 0376'15, SB 0377'15, SB 0378'15, SB 0380'15, SB 0381'15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 116 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 430 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 430 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0068'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/5/2016 @ 1:36 Pm |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved By Governor 4/5/2016 @ 11:42 Am |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/28/2016 @ 2:37 Pm |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-03-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-03-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 116 Yeas 101 Nays 8 |
2016-03-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-03-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-03-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-10-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2015-10-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-14 | House | Received On 10/14/2015 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 430 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rebekah Warren |