MI SB0378 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Individual income tax: credit; qualified child tax credit; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 254.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual income tax: credit; qualified child tax credit; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 254.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 186 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2021-05-18HouseRead A First Time
2021-05-18HouseReceived On 05/13/2021
2021-05-13SenatePassed Roll Call # 186 Yeas 25 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-05-13SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2021-05-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-05-12SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-05-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-04-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-04-29SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-04-21SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2021-04-21SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Runestad

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0378
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0378.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0378.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0378-00C76.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0378-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0378-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0378-B.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0378-03D2D6F1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-04-29-037.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-05-13-043.htm

Bill Comments

feedback