MI SB0375 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0260'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0260'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; funds; state survey and remonumentation fund; revise to allow expenditures for monumentation of state border. Amends secs. 2 & 12 of 1990 PA 345 (MCL 54.262 & 54.272). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0374'09
Title
State financing and management; funds; state survey and remonumentation fund; revise to allow expenditures for monumentation of state border. Amends secs. 2 & 12 of 1990 PA 345 (MCL 54.262 & 54.272). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0374'09
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Birkholz [R] | Sen. Alan Cropsey [R] | Sen. Thomas George [R] | Sen. Ronald Jelinek [R] |
Sen. Gerald Van Woerkom [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0260'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2010 @ 2:12 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/14/2010 @ 12:38 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/8/2010 @ 3:33 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-02 | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 620 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-02 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-02 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 524 Yeas 60 Nays 38 | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-02 | Amended | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-05-12 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-05-06 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | |
2009-05-06 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-06 | Received On 05/06/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Passed Roll Call # 146 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-05-05 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-05-05 | Substitute S-2 Concurred In | |
2009-05-05 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-04-30 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-04-30 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-04-30 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-03-12 | Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs |