MI SB0372 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 166'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 166'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; retail sales; requirement to tag certain beer kegs; eliminate. Repeals sec. 1030 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.2030).
Title
Liquor; retail sales; requirement to tag certain beer kegs; eliminate. Repeals sec. 1030 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.2030).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 325 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 230 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 230 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 166'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/13/2017 @ 10:04 Am |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/9/2017 @ 11:17 Am |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/7/2017 @ 3:14 Pm |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-10-25 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-10-25 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-10-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 325 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2017-10-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-09-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-09-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-05-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-05-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-30 | House | Received On 05/30/2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 230 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Goeffrey Hansen |