MI SB0369 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Occupations: pawnbrokers; allowable rate of interest charged by pawnbrokers; increase. Amends sec. 9 of 1917 PA 273 (MCL 446.209).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupations: pawnbrokers; allowable rate of interest charged by pawnbrokers; increase. Amends sec. 9 of 1917 PA 273 (MCL 446.209).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 309 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-06-24HouseRead A Second Time
2020-06-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-06-17HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2020-06-03HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-11-20HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-11-20HouseRead A First Time
2019-11-13HouseReceived On 11/13/2019
2019-11-13SenatePassed Roll Call # 309 Yeas 24 Nays 12 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-11-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-11-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-10-30SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-10-30SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-10-30SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-06-12SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-06-12SenateIntroduced By Senator Peter J. Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback