MI SB0363 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
Pending: House Commerce And Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State financing and management; purchasing; state contracts; provide preference to certain Michigan-based firms. Amends sec. 261 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1261).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State financing and management; purchasing; state contracts; provide preference to certain Michigan-based firms. Amends sec. 261 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1261).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 221 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
2017-05-24HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-24HouseReceived On 05/24/2017
2017-05-24SenatePassed Roll Call # 221 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2017-05-23SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-05-23SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-05-18SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-05-18SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-05-18SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-05-09SenateReassigned To Committee On Commerce
2017-05-04SenateReferred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
2017-05-04SenateIntroduced By Senator Rick Jones

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback