MI SB0354 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising registration plate for the Knights of Columbus; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 811ll.
Title
Vehicles; fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising registration plate for the Knights of Columbus; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 811ll.
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 253 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-06-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-15 | House | Received On 06/14/2017 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 253 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Proos |