MI SB0353 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0543'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0543'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; violations; any intoxicating substance; include in definition of "operating while intoxicated". Amends sec. 625 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625).
Title
Traffic control; violations; any intoxicating substance; include in definition of "operating while intoxicated". Amends sec. 625 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625).
Sponsors
Sen. John Brandenburg [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Sen. David Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1020 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 804 (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 777 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 804 (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 777 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0543'12 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 4:40 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 1:09 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 1:32 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1020 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 804 Yeas 101 Nays 9 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | House | Amended |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2012 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 777 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-4 Adopted |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |