MI SB0350 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Assigned Pa 0086'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Assigned Pa 0086'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; delinquent taxes; delinquent tax collections by villages; modify procedures. Amends sec. 18 of 1895 PA 3 (MCL 69.18).
Title
Property tax; delinquent taxes; delinquent tax collections by villages; modify procedures. Amends sec. 18 of 1895 PA 3 (MCL 69.18).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 215 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 10 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 10 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0086'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/11/2020 10:35 Am |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Approved By Governor 06/11/2020 09:41 Am |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/02/2020 01:58 Pm |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-05-27 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-05-27 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 215 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-05-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2020-01-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-14 | House | Received On 01/14/2020 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 10 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kimberly A. Lasata |