MI SB0343 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0242'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0242'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; students; provision to students of certain information concerning career outlook; provide for. Amends sec. 1278c of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278c).
Title
Education; students; provision to students of certain information concerning career outlook; provide for. Amends sec. 1278c of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278c).
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 (Y: 96 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 237 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 237 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0242'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/28/2018 @ 2:16 Pm |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/27/2018 @ 9:24 Pm |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/25/2018 @ 1:30 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 Yeas 96 Nays 13 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-06-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Workforce And Talent Development |
2017-06-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-07 | House | Received On 06/07/2017 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 237 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Proos |
Subjects
Education: career and technical
Education: curriculum
Education: graduation requirements
Education: school districts
Education: students
Education: curriculum
Education: graduation requirements
Education: school districts
Education: students