MI SB0340 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Presented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:28 Am
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health; pharmaceuticals; remote pharmacies; allow under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 17707, 17708, 17709, 17722, 17726, 17739, 17741, 17742, 17748, 17751, 17752 & 17768 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17707 et seq.) & adds secs. 17742a & 17742b.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; pharmaceuticals; remote pharmacies; allow under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 17707, 17708, 17709, 17722, 17726, 17739, 17741, 17742, 17748, 17751, 17752 & 17768 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17707 et seq.) & adds secs. 17742a & 17742b.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 3 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 355 (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 194 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenatePresented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:28 Am
2020-01-08SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-01-08SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2020-01-08SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-01-08SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 3 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-01-08SenateHouse Substitute (h-3) Concurred In
2019-12-19SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-12-11HouseReturned To Senate
2019-12-11HouseTitle Amended
2019-12-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 355 Yeas 98 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-12-11HouseRead A Third Time
2019-12-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-12-10HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2019-12-10HouseRead A Second Time
2019-12-04HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-12-04HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
2019-11-05HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
2019-09-05HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2019-09-05HouseRead A First Time
2019-09-05HouseReceived On 09/05/2019
2019-09-05SenatePassed Roll Call # 194 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-09-04SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended
2019-09-04SenateSubstitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In
2019-09-04SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s)
2019-06-18SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2019-06-18SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-06-18SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-05-22SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2019-05-22SenateIntroduced By Senator Curtis S. Vanderwall

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0340
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0340.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0340.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0340.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0340.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-18-062.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-09-05-082.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-12-04-111.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-12-11-114.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-01-08-001.htm

Bill Comments

feedback