MI SB0338 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Assigned Pa 0072'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; crime of performing clitoridectomy, infibulation, or other female genital mutilation; provide sentencing guidelines for. Amends sec. 16g, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16g). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0337'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; crime of performing clitoridectomy, infibulation, or other female genital mutilation; provide sentencing guidelines for. Amends sec. 16g, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16g). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0337'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 213 (Y: 103 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 190 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12SenateAssigned Pa 0072'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-07-12SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 7/11/2017 @ 1:08 Pm
2017-07-12SenateApproved By Governor 7/11/2017 @ 11:53 Am
2017-07-12SenatePresented To Governor 6/28/2017 @ 12:14 Pm
2017-06-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-22SenateFull Title Agreed To
2017-06-22SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-06-15HouseReturned To Senate
2017-06-15HouseInserted Full Title
2017-06-15HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 213 Yeas 103 Nays 4
2017-06-15HouseRead A Third Time
2017-06-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-06-07HouseRead A Second Time
2017-06-06HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-06-06HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-05-17HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2017-05-17HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-17HouseReceived On 05/17/2017
2017-05-17SenatePassed Roll Call # 190 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2017-05-16SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-05-16SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-05-04SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-05-04SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-05-04SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-04-27SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2017-04-27SenateIntroduced By Senator Rick Jones

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0338
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0338.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0338.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0338.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0338.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0072.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-05-04-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-05-17-047.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-06-06-053.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-06-15-058.htm

Bill Comments

feedback