MI SB0335 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Assigned Pa 0058'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Assigned Pa 0058'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; health; health insurance claims assessment; extend the sunset. Amends enacting section 2 of 2011 PA 142 (MCL 550.1731 - 550.1741).
Title
Insurance; health; health insurance claims assessment; extend the sunset. Amends enacting section 2 of 2011 PA 142 (MCL 550.1731 - 550.1741).
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Kahn [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 164 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 170 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 170 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0058'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/11/2013 @ 4:00 Pm |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/11/2013 @ 9:38 Am |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/3/2013 @ 11:12 Am |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2013-05-22 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 164 Yeas 65 Nays 44 |
2013-05-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-05-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-16 | House | Received On 05/16/2013 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 170 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Roger Kahn |