MI SB0333 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Assigned Pa 0101'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Assigned Pa 0101'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; business court; types of cases heard by the business court; revise. Amends secs. 8031 & 8035 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8031 & 600.8035).
Title
Courts; business court; types of cases heard by the business court; revise. Amends secs. 8031 & 8035 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8031 & 600.8035).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 286 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 184 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 184 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-06 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0101'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/13/2017 @ 3:32 Pm |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/13/2017 @ 12:31 Pm |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 7/11/2017 @ 2:46 Pm |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-06-22 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 286 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-06-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-20 | House | Amended |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-05-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-16 | House | Received On 05/16/2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 184 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |