MI SB0332 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0357'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0357'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; drinking age; penalties for minor in possession (MIP); modify. Amends sec. 703 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1703).
Title
Liquor; drinking age; penalties for minor in possession (MIP); modify. Amends sec. 703 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1703).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Steven Bieda [D] | Sen. Jim Stamas [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 682 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 550 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 86 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 550 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 86 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0357'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2016 @ 1:34 Pm |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/21/2016 @ 11:42 Am |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/14/2016 @ 2:20 Pm |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Roll Call # 682 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-07 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2016-12-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-06 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 550 Yeas 105 Nays 1 |
2016-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-01 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2016-12-01 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2016-12-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2016-03-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-03-03 | House | Received On 03/03/2016 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 86 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |