MI SB0315 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: securities; notification and temporary hold on certain account disbursements for the protection of certain adults by broker-dealers and investment advisors; allow. Amends title of 2008 PA 551 (MCL 451.2101 - 451.2703) & adds art. 5A.
Title
Occupations: securities; notification and temporary hold on certain account disbursements for the protection of certain adults by broker-dealers and investment advisors; allow. Amends title of 2008 PA 551 (MCL 451.2101 - 451.2703) & adds art. 5A.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 350 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 350 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2021-09-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2021-09-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-09-14 | House | Received On 09/14/2021 |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 350 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Finance |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Banking |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Runestad |
Subjects
Occupations: advisors and counselors
Occupations: securities
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services
Occupations: securities
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services