MI SB0312 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0210'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0210'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; financial aid; promise zone authority act; make general revisions. Amends secs. 3, 5, 7, 11, 15 & 17 of 2008 PA 549 (MCL 390.1663 et seq.).
Title
Higher education; financial aid; promise zone authority act; make general revisions. Amends secs. 3, 5, 7, 11, 15 & 17 of 2008 PA 549 (MCL 390.1663 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 500 (Y: 96 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 419 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 419 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0210'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/23/2013 @ 4:48 Pm |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/21/2013 @ 4:06 Pm |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/18/2013 @ 2:30 Pm 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-12-12 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2013-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2013-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 500 Yeas 96 Nays 13 |
2013-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-12-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2013-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-17 | House | Received On 10/17/2013 |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 419 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Goeffrey Hansen |
Same As/Similar To
HB4575 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - Referred To Committee On Education
Subjects
Higher education, financial aid
Local government, authorities
State agencies (existing), treasury
Taxation, other
Local government, authorities
State agencies (existing), treasury
Taxation, other