MI SB0303 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0239'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0239'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; funding; land exchange facilitation fund; authorize to be used for natural resources management costs. Amends secs. 2134, 2135, 2154 & 51106 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.2134 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4475'17, SB 0302'17
Title
Natural resources; funding; land exchange facilitation fund; authorize to be used for natural resources management costs. Amends secs. 2134, 2135, 2154 & 51106 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.2134 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4475'17, SB 0302'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 538 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 508 (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 409 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 508 (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 409 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0239'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/27/2018 @ 3:00 Pm |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/27/2018 @ 2:39 Pm |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:00 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call # 538 Yeas 24 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 508 Yeas 67 Nays 42 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-22 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-10-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2017-10-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-19 | House | Received On 10/19/2017 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 409 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |