MI SB0297 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Assigned Pa 0151'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Assigned Pa 0151'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; individual licensing and regulation; presentation of identification to certain government officials; require, and revise scope of practice for electricians. Amends secs. 201, 701, 713 & 731 of 2016 PA 407 (MCL 339.5201 et seq.).
Title
Occupations; individual licensing and regulation; presentation of identification to certain government officials; require, and revise scope of practice for electricians. Amends secs. 201, 701, 713 & 731 of 2016 PA 407 (MCL 339.5201 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 258 (Y: 89 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 244 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 244 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0151'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/16/2018 @ 10:14 Am |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/15/2018 @ 1:58 Pm |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/8/2018 @ 1:33 Pm |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-05-01 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 258 Yeas 89 Nays 20 |
2018-05-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-11-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-11-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-08 | House | Received On 06/08/2017 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 244 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kenneth Horn |
Subjects
Construction: inspectors
Occupations: electricians
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
Occupations: inspectors
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: electricians
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
Occupations: inspectors
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs