MI SB0291 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: supplemental; appropriations for multiple departments and branches for fiscal year 2023-2024; provide for. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations: supplemental; appropriations for multiple departments and branches for fiscal year 2023-2024; provide for. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 264 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2023-05-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-16 | House | Received On 05/11/2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 264 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Sarah Anthony |