MI SB0290 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Assigned Pa 0130'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; recounts; recount fee; increase for certain recounts. Amends secs. 867 & 881 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.867 & 168.881).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; recounts; recount fee; increase for certain recounts. Amends secs. 867 & 881 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.867 & 168.881).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 214 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 230 (Y: 93 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 201 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateAssigned Pa 0130'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-05-08SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 5/3/2018 @ 11:36 Am
2018-05-08SenateApproved By Governor 5/2/2018 @ 8:50 Pm
2018-04-26SenatePresented To Governor 4/25/2018 @ 12:14 Pm
2018-04-19SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-04-19SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-04-19SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-04-19Senate Roll Call # 214 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-04-19SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2018-04-18HouseReturned To Senate
2018-04-18HouseInserted Full Title
2018-04-18HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 230 Yeas 93 Nays 16
2018-04-18HouseRead A Third Time
2017-10-31HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-10-31HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2017-10-31HouseRead A Second Time
2017-10-26HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-10-26HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-05-23HouseReferred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
2017-05-23HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-23HouseReceived On 05/23/2017
2017-05-23SenatePassed Roll Call # 201 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2017-05-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-05-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-05-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-05-09SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-05-09SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-03-30SenateReferred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform
2017-03-30SenateIntroduced By Senator David Robertson

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0290
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0290.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0290.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0290.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0290.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0130.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-05-09-044.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-05-23-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-26-083.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-04-18-037.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-04-19-038.htm

Bill Comments

feedback