MI SB0283 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Assigned Pa 0038'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Assigned Pa 0038'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education: school districts; authority of school districts and school employees to administer opioid antagonists in the revised school code; repeal. Amends secs. 5 & 1178 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.5 & 380.1178) & repeals sec. 1179b of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1179b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0200'19, HB 4367'19
Title
Education: school districts; authority of school districts and school employees to administer opioid antagonists in the revised school code; repeal. Amends secs. 5 & 1178 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.5 & 380.1178) & repeals sec. 1179b of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1179b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0200'19, HB 4367'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 132 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 117 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 117 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0038'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/26/2019 03:28 Pm |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 06/26/2019 01:39 Pm |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/20/2019 03:44 Pm |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2019-06-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-06-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2019-06-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 132 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-05-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-22 | House | Received On 05/22/2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 117 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter J. Lucido |
Subjects
Controlled substances: other
Education: safety
Education: school districts
State agencies (existing): education
Education: safety
Education: school districts
State agencies (existing): education