MI SB0279 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Assigned Pa 0094'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Assigned Pa 0094'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: driver license; designation as an individual with a communication impediment; allow in enhanced driver license and official state personal identification card, and provide for law enforcement access. Amends sec. 5 of 2008 PA 23 (MCL 28.305). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0278'19, SB 0278'19, HB 5541'20
Title
Traffic control: driver license; designation as an individual with a communication impediment; allow in enhanced driver license and official state personal identification card, and provide for law enforcement access. Amends sec. 5 of 2008 PA 23 (MCL 28.305). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0278'19, SB 0278'19, HB 5541'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 171 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 245 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 245 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0094'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/23/2020 03:16 Pm |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Approved By Governor 06/23/2020 02:35 Pm |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/17/2020 01:27 Pm |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 171 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2020-06-10 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-06-10 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-06-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-05-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-10-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-16 | House | Received On 10/16/2019 |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 245 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2020-06-11 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis Hertel |
Subjects
Disabilities: other
Law enforcement: law enforcement information network (LEIN)
State agencies (existing): state
State agencies (existing): state police
State: identification cards
Traffic control: driver license
Law enforcement: law enforcement information network (LEIN)
State agencies (existing): state
State agencies (existing): state police
State: identification cards
Traffic control: driver license