MI SB0278 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 0173'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 0173'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Libraries; state; interstate library compact; create. Creates new act.
Title
Libraries; state; interstate library compact; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 340 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 268 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 268 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0173'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/21/2017 @ 3:40 Pm |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/20/2017 @ 10:36 Am |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/16/2017 @ 3:12 Pm |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-11-01 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-11-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 340 Yeas 105 Nays 3 |
2017-11-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2017-06-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-15 | House | Received On 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 268 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Proos |