MI SB0277 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: election officials; county clerks to update the qualified voter file to cancel the voter registration records of deceased voters; require, require electronic notification to city and township clerks of canceled voter registration records, and require the secretary of state to post data on the department's website regarding canceled voter registration records. Amends secs. 509o & 510 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.509o & 168.510).
Title
Elections: election officials; county clerks to update the qualified voter file to cancel the voter registration records of deceased voters; require, require electronic notification to city and township clerks of canceled voter registration records, and require the secretary of state to post data on the department's website regarding canceled voter registration records. Amends secs. 509o & 510 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.509o & 168.510).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 446 (Y: 80 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 303 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 299 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 303 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 299 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 10/15/2021 |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/05/2021 01:35 Pm |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2021-09-30 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-09-30 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2021-09-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 446 Yeas 80 Nays 25 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2021-09-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-09-30 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-09-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-09-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-09-30 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2021-09-30 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-09-30 | House | Rule Suspended |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-06-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-24 | House | Received On 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 303 Yeas 31 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 299 Yeas 32 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael D. Macdonald |