MI SB0270 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0247'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0247'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; controlled substances; bona fide prescriber-patient relationship before prescribing schedule 2 to 5 controlled substances; require in certain circumstances. Amends secs. 7303a, 16221 & 16226 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7303a et seq.) & adds sec. 16204e.
Title
Health; controlled substances; bona fide prescriber-patient relationship before prescribing schedule 2 to 5 controlled substances; require in certain circumstances. Amends secs. 7303a, 16221 & 16226 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7303a et seq.) & adds sec. 16204e.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 564 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 481 (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 298 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 481 (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 298 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0247'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2017 @ 2:18 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/27/2017 @ 12:07 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/19/2017 @ 9:28 Am |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 564 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2017-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-12-13 | House | Title Amended |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 481 Yeas 102 Nays 8 |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-12-06 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2017-12-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-07-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-07-12 | House | Received On 06/22/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 298 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Steven Bieda |
Subjects
Controlled substances: schedules
Health occupations: physicians
Health: controlled substances
Health: occupations
Health: pharmaceuticals
Health occupations: physicians
Health: controlled substances
Health: occupations
Health: pharmaceuticals