MI SB0270 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0498'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0498'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Probate; guardians and conservators; probate court jurisdiction over guardianship and conservatorship proceedings; clarify. Amends 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.1101 - 700.8206) by adding secs. 5301b & 5402a.
Title
Probate; guardians and conservators; probate court jurisdiction over guardianship and conservatorship proceedings; clarify. Amends 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.1101 - 700.8206) by adding secs. 5301b & 5402a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 686 (Y: 64 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 176 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 176 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0498'16 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/6/2017 @ 1:40 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/5/2017 @ 1:41 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/3/2017 @ 12:16 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 686 Yeas 64 Nays 42 |
2016-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-05-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-05-14 | House | Received On 05/14/2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 176 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |