MI SB0266 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0343'10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Advertising; billboards; billboards for sexually oriented businesses; regulate. Amends sec. 18a of 1972 PA 106 (MCL 252.318a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advertising; billboards; billboards for sexually oriented businesses; regulate. Amends sec. 18a of 1972 PA 106 (MCL 252.318a).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-12-29 Assigned Pa 0343'10
2010-12-29 Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2010 @ 4:04 Pm
2010-12-29 Approved By Governor 12/21/2010 @ 12:15 Pm
2010-12-29 Presented To Governor 12/17/2010 @ 2:04 Pm
2010-12-15 Ordered Enrolled
2010-12-15 Full Title Agreed To
2010-12-15 Immediate Effect Defeated
2010-12-15 House Inserted Full Title
2010-12-03 Returned To Senate
2010-12-03 Inserted Full Title
2010-12-03 Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 589 Yeas 86 Nays 8
2010-12-03 Read A Third Time
2010-12-03 Placed On Immediate Passage
2010-12-03 Placed On Third Reading
2010-12-03 Read A Second Time
2010-12-03 Placed On Second Reading
2010-12-03 Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
2010-12-03 Rule Suspended
2009-08-19 Referred To Committee On Transportation
2009-08-19 Read A First Time
2009-08-19 Received On 08/19/2009
2009-08-19 Passed Roll Call # 404 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2009-08-19 Placed On Immediate Passage
2009-08-19 Rules Suspended
2009-08-19 Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3
2009-08-19 Substitute S-3 Concurred In
2009-08-19 Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3
2009-05-13 Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
2009-05-13 Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
2009-05-13 Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2
2009-02-19 Referred To Committee On Transportation

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback