MI SB0260 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Assigned Pa 0099'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Higher education; education programs; authorization and distance education reciprocal exchange act; extend sunset. Amends sec. 7 of 2015 PA 45 (MCL 390.1697).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education; education programs; authorization and distance education reciprocal exchange act; extend sunset. Amends sec. 7 of 2015 PA 45 (MCL 390.1697).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 252 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 242 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-16SenateAssigned Pa 0099'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-08-16SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 7/13/2017 @ 3:28 Pm
2017-08-16SenateApproved By Governor 7/13/2017 @ 12:27 Pm
2017-07-12SenatePresented To Governor 7/11/2017 @ 2:42 Pm
2017-06-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-22SenateFull Title Agreed To
2017-06-22SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-06-20HouseReturned To Senate
2017-06-20HouseInserted Full Title
2017-06-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 252 Yeas 107 Nays 0
2017-06-20HouseRead A Third Time
2017-06-20HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-06-20HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-06-20HouseRead A Second Time
2017-06-20HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-06-20HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-06-08HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2017-06-08HouseRead A First Time
2017-06-08HouseReceived On 06/08/2017
2017-06-08SenatePassed Roll Call # 242 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2017-06-07SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-06-07SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-05-16SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-05-16SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-05-16SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-03-21SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2017-03-21SenateIntroduced By Senator David Hildenbrand

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback