MI SB0258 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Assigned Pa 0076'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Assigned Pa 0076'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Communications: newspapers and magazines; publication of public notices in newspapers; include requirements for publication by electronic means. Amends sec. 1 of 1963 PA 247 (MCL 691.1051).
Title
Communications: newspapers and magazines; publication of public notices in newspapers; include requirements for publication by electronic means. Amends sec. 1 of 1963 PA 247 (MCL 691.1051).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 174 (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 364 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 364 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0076'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 05/12/2022 09:50 Am |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 05/12/2022 09:05 Am |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Presented To Governor 05/05/2022 09:14 Am |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2022-04-28 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 174 Yeas 61 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2022-04-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-04-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-10-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2021-10-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-05 | House | Received On 10/05/2021 |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 364 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis S. Vanderwall |