MI SB0254 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Presented To Governor 06/30/2020 10:57 Am
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health; controlled substances; requirement for opioid and benzodiazepine prescriptions to be electronically transmitted to pharmacies; provide for under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 7333, 16221 & 16226 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7333 et seq.) & adds sec. 7333c. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4217'19, SB 0248'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; controlled substances; requirement for opioid and benzodiazepine prescriptions to be electronically transmitted to pharmacies; provide for under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 7333, 16221 & 16226 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7333 et seq.) & adds sec. 7333c. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4217'19, SB 0248'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 246 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 363 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenatePresented To Governor 06/30/2020 10:57 Am
2020-06-25SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-25SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2020-06-25SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-06-25SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 246 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-06-25SenateHouse Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
2020-06-24HouseReturned To Senate
2020-06-24HouseTitle Amended
2020-06-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 Yeas 105 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2020-06-24HouseRead A Third Time
2020-06-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-06-10HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-06-10HouseRead A Second Time
2020-05-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-05-27HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2020-03-05HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2019-12-11HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2019-12-11HouseRead A First Time
2019-12-11HouseReceived On 12/11/2019
2019-12-11SenatePassed Roll Call # 363 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-12-10SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2019-12-10SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2019-12-10SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2019-06-18SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2019-06-18SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-06-18SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2019-04-09SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2019-04-09SenateIntroduced By Senator Dale Zorn

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0254
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0254.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0254.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0254.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0254.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-18-062.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-12-11-115.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-05-27-046.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-06-24-058.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-06-25-058.htm

Bill Comments

feedback