MI SB0253 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 0158'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal years 2016-2017 and 2017-2018. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal years 2016-2017 and 2017-2018. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-31 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 335 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 406 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 298 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 351 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-28SenateAssigned Pa 0158'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-11-28SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 11/9/2017 @ 9:10 Am
2017-11-28SenateApproved By Governor 11/8/2017 @ 2:45 Pm
2017-11-07SenatePresented To Governor 11/6/2017 @ 2:50 Pm
2017-10-31HouseRe-returned To Senate
2017-10-31House Roll Call # 335 Yeas 105 Nays 2
2017-10-31HouseSenate Amendment(s) To House Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2017-10-19HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2017-10-19HouseRe-returned From Senate With Amendment(s) To House Substitute H-1 With Immediate Effect
2017-11-01SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-10-19SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2017-10-19SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-10-19Senate Roll Call # 406 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2017-10-19SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In As Amended
2017-10-19SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2017-10-11SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2017-10-10HouseReturned To Senate
2017-10-10HouseTitle Amended
2017-10-10HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 298 Yeas 104 Nays 2
2017-10-10HouseRead A Third Time
2017-10-10HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-10-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-10-10HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted And Amended
2017-10-10HouseRead A Second Time
2017-10-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-10-05HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-09-27HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2017-09-27HouseRead A First Time
2017-09-27HouseReceived On 09/27/2017
2017-09-27SenatePassed Roll Call # 351 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2017-09-27SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-09-27SenateRules Suspended
2017-09-27SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3
2017-09-27SenateSubstitute S-3 Concurred In
2017-09-27SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3
2017-09-26SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2017-09-26SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-09-26SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-03-21SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2017-03-21SenateIntroduced By Senator David Hildenbrand

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0253
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0253.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0253.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0253.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0253.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0158.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-09-26-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-09-27-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-05-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-10-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-10-19-085.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-31-084.htm

Bill Comments

feedback