MI SB0242 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0122'21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0122'21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Counties: boards and commissions; county board of commissioners; provide for 4-year terms. Amends secs. 10 & 12 of 1966 PA 261 (MCL 46.410 & 46.412). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0245'21
Title
Counties: boards and commissions; county board of commissioners; provide for 4-year terms. Amends secs. 10 & 12 of 1966 PA 261 (MCL 46.410 & 46.412). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0245'21
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 587 (Y: 75 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 246 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 246 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0122'21 |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/17/2021 04:12 Pm |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/16/2021 05:21 Pm |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/14/2021 09:32 Am |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-12-08 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-12-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 587 Yeas 75 Nays 29 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-06-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2021-06-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-03 | House | Received On 06/03/2021 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 246 Yeas 32 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom |