MI SB0235 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 0069'24 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Holidays: other; "Blue Star Mothers Day"; designate as February 1. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Holidays: other; "Blue Star Mothers Day"; designate as February 1. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 326 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-30SenateAssigned Pa 0069'24 With Immediate Effect
2024-07-30SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 07/08/2024 01:06 Pm
2024-07-30SenateApproved By Governor 07/08/2024 09:30 Am
2024-06-27SenatePresented To Governor 06/26/2024 02:42 Pm
2024-06-18SenateOrdered Enrolled
2024-06-18SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2024-06-13HouseReturned To Senate
2024-06-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2024-06-13HouseRead A Third Time
2024-06-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-06-12HouseRead A Second Time
2024-06-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-06-05HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2023-06-07HouseReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2023-06-07HouseRead A First Time
2023-06-07HouseReceived On 06/06/2023
2023-06-07SenatePassed Roll Call # 326 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2023-06-06SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2023-06-06SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2023-05-25SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2023-05-25SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2023-03-23SenateReferred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
2023-03-23SenateIntroduced By Senator Rick Outman

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-SB-0235
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2023-SIB-0235.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBS-0235.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBH-0235.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2023-SNB-0235.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/publicact/htm/2024-PA-0069.htm
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0235-G.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0235-F.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0235-DC15C4A4.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0235-3FBAE2DA.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0235-U.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0235-22F1FA29.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0235-4C68D36A.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-05-25-051.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-06-07-054.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-06-05-050.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-06-13-054.htm

Bill Comments

feedback