MI SB0230 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-26 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-26 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor: spirits; entitlement of discount on uniform prices; extend sunset, and waive certain license renewal fees. Amends secs. 233 & 525 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1233 & 436.1525).
Title
Liquor: spirits; entitlement of discount on uniform prices; extend sunset, and waive certain license renewal fees. Amends secs. 233 & 525 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1233 & 436.1525).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 108 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 108 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-04-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-28 | House | Received On 04/28/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 108 Yeas 19 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom |