MI SB0223 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-19 - Assigned Pa 0128'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-19 - Assigned Pa 0128'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; records; maintain record for separation of employment; require, and establish that agency is immune from civil liability. Creates new act.
Title
Law enforcement; records; maintain record for separation of employment; require, and establish that agency is immune from civil liability. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 82 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 82 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0128'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/17/2017 @ 2:16 Pm |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/17/2017 @ 12:19 Pm |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/13/2017 @ 9:50 Am |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-10-03 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-10-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2017-10-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-09-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-09-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-03-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-23 | House | Received On 03/23/2017 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 82 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |