MI SB0217 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct; references to married minors in the Michigan penal code; modify. Amends secs. 13, 520d, 520e & 520l of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.13 et seq.).
Title
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct; references to married minors in the Michigan penal code; modify. Amends secs. 13, 520d, 520e & 520l of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.13 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 376 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2023-06-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-22 | House | Received On 06/22/2023 |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 376 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Sarah Anthony |