MI SB0209 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-30 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-30 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; instruction in certain United States historical information; encourage, and require to be included on state testing. Amends sec. 1278 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278) & adds secs. 1167 & 1279h.
Title
Education; school districts; instruction in certain United States historical information; encourage, and require to be included on state testing. Amends sec. 1278 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278) & adds secs. 1167 & 1279h.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 285 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 285 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2015-11-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-06-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-06-11 | House | Received On 06/11/2015 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 285 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Patrick Colbeck |