MI SB0203 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Assigned Pa 0003'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Assigned Pa 0003'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marihuana: licenses; definition of applicant; modify. Amends sec. 102 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27102).
Title
Medical marihuana: licenses; definition of applicant; modify. Amends sec. 102 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27102).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 48 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 12 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 12 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0003'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 04/16/2019 02:36 Pm |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 04/16/2019 01:27 Pm |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Presented To Governor 04/16/2019 06:28 Am |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2019-04-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 48 Yeas 109 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-21 | House | Received On 03/21/2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 12 Yeas 28 Nays 9 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Macdonald |
Subjects
Medical marihuana: facilities
Medical marihuana: licenses
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Medical marihuana: licenses
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs